Accounts and annual returns ALLERTON EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1064326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 August 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 March 2022 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 March 2021 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required