Financial history THE CARERS CENTRE (BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE)

Charity number: 1063226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.19m £1.27m £1.45m £1.26m £1.34m
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.22m £1.28m £1.32m £1.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.26m
Income from government grants £842.59k £901.70k £915.36k £963.99k £0
Income - Donations and legacies £64.57k £53.32k £26.92k £66.49k £48.85k
Income - Other trading activities £20.26k £19.78k £14.27k £3.13k £3.18k
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.19m £1.40m £1.18m £1.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.38k £316 £557 £10.95k £23.89k
Income - Other £7.19k £3.74k £2.27k £485 £778
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.21m £1.27m £1.31m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.11k £9.42k £8.57k £8.56k £36.40k
Expenditure - Governance £4.74k £4.66k £4.26k £5.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0