THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF AXMINSTER HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising,i.e. fetes, concerts. Voluntary work in community. Maintaining public interest and support with meetings, newsletters and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 August 1997: Standard registration
- AXMINSTER HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR STEVE HOLT | Chair | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DELIA ELAINE DRIVER | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Trudy Churchill | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Cawley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Thomas Hussey | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Ann Ellis | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Ann Ward | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Susan Pike | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Irene Cross | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN SYMES | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CONSTANCE GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PHILIP JAMES RALPH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.10k | £28.25k | £24.20k | £13.00k | £144.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.15k | £212.84k | £97.28k | £6.00k | £30.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Axminster Hospital
Chard Street
AXMINSTER
Devon
EX13 5DU
- Phone:
- 07909442209
- Email:
- AXMLOF@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
axmlof.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window