THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MICHAEL, PLAYDEN, EAST SUSSEX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising events - Playden Weekend, Open Gardens, Quiz, Party, Treasure Hunts etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 June 1997: Standard registration
- 31 August 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE FRIENDS OF PLAYDEN CHURCH (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF PLAYDEN CHURCH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.54k | £3.67k | £4.92k | £2.12k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29 | £30.00k | £5.01k | £7 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 08 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF PLAYDEN CHURCH AND ALL IN THE CURTILAGE THEREOF , AND TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE CHURCH AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
PLAYDEN AND RYE ,EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window