BRIXTON MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a place for Muslim worshippers to pray and practice the religion of islam in a safe environment. To educate the Muslims young and old in theh tennents of Islam. To link the Muslim community to the rest of the community in Lambeth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 09 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDI MOHAMED NUR | Chair | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOUSTAPHA MOUNDE | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ian Henry | Trustee | 08 August 2014 |
|
|||||
JAFFAR JEFFREY | Trustee | 23 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Carey ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
RAYMOND JAMAL BOAKYE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.22k | £90.24k | £79.64k | £113.37k | £143.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.61k | £83.72k | £75.26k | £100.56k | £169.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2021 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2021 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 8TH JUNE 1997, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 30TH AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; AND TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 GRESHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW9 7PH
- Phone:
- 020 7326 4098
- Email:
- info@brixtonmasjid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window