DALAID


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has appointed an Interim Manager Open in new window for the charity
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty & Advancement of Jewish Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 02 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £838.90k | £993.55k | £924.98k | £666.78k | £5.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £801.39k | £988.95k | £840.06k | £960.60k | £24.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £838.02k | £993.20k | £924.94k | £666.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £878 | £341 | £35 | £589 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £801.39k | £988.95k | £840.06k | £960.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.10k | £1.80k | £1.80k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £985.93k | £837.80k | £960.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TO JEWISH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penningtons Manches Cooper Llp
Clarendon House
Clarendon Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8FH
- Phone:
- 01223 465465
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window