THE HUNDRED OF HOO NURSERY
Charity number: 1064951
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide childcare facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Total income: £288,790
Total expenditure: £292,744
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 21 October 1997: Standard registration
- 23 July 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 July 2010: Funds transferred to 1131001 THE HUNDRED OF HOO NURSERY AND KIDS CLUB LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.35k | £227.80k | £276.82k | £258.09k | £288.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.94k | £231.71k | £237.26k | £250.33k | £292.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 17 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 06 July 2009 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 21 December 2009 | 174 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 05 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 04 September 2007 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 07 September 2007 | 69 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 18 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 21 April 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS IN THE SCHOOL AND TO EDUCATE ALL THE CHILDREN IN THE NURSERY'S CARE FROM THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ROCHESTER
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window