THE STOKE HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Computer, English, maths classes. Older persons club, Youth activities, Crafty Tots, Weeze Stay and Play, Apostolic Faith UK Mission, French Church. Grub Hub, Warm Hub, After-School Club, Monday Over 50's Lunch Club. Bingo night.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,485 from 17485 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 07 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muamiki Charlotte Ebenoo Bobangue | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Kumar | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Surbey | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Smith | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Tauseef Raja | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jody Line | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Foulkes | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.03k | £99.16k | £66.01k | £114.09k | £49.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.95k | £67.60k | £73.28k | £69.98k | £81.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.51k | N/A | N/A | £17.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE STOKE HEATH AREA OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY (AS SHOWN ON THE MAP ATTACHED) (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISTIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
STOKE HEATH AREA OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stoke Heath Community Centre
14 Burroughs Close
COVENTRY
CV2 3QH
- Phone:
- 02476449580
- Email:
- s-h-c-c@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window