Trustees EAST LONDON ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS
Charity Number: 1062952

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Lasher | Chair | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Loze-Thwaite | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Hugh Davison | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Born | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Dunne | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Fitzgerald | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Arlindo Angelo Villaschi Neto | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL GILLETT | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
MR MIKE COGGINS | Trustee | 02 March 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.