BARNET MULTICULTURAL COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barnet Multicultural Community Centre (BMCC) aims to promote and develop opportunity and participation for the whole community in order to increase integration and inclusion and reduce isolation and deprivation, within a social, informative, celebratory, multicultural setting therefore enhance the quality of life in Barnet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 21 July 1997: Standard registration
- BMCC (Working name)
- ALGERNON RAOD MULTICULTURAL DAY CARE CENTRE LTD. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMED SALAH | Chair | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rasmika patel | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMA ABDI AHMED | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
AWEYS YUSUF | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.86k | £72.04k | £64.43k | £50.40k | £64.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.66k | £46.65k | £56.65k | £83.97k | £67.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.07k | £22.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 April 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 April 2025 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION IN CORPORATE ON 19 MARCH 1997 as amended on 26 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABLEMENT AND OLD AGE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF THE PUBLIC, AND PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALGERNON ROAD
HENDON
LONDON
NW4 3TA
- Phone:
- 02082023794
- Email:
- bookings@barnetmcc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window