FRIENDS OF DORKING NURSERY SCHOOL AND CHILDREN'S CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Dorking Nursery School organises fundraising activities to support Dorking Nursery School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 June 1997: Standard registration
- F O N D S (Working name)
- F O N D (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF DORKING NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Harwood-Duffy | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £36 | £7.57k | £7.95k | £3.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £0 | £4.07k | £5.65k | £3.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 March 2025 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH NOVEMBER 1994, AND AMENDED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1995, 6TH NOVEMBER 1995 AND 2 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
DORKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dorking Nursery School
West Street
Dorking
RH4 1BY
- Phone:
- 01306882397
- Email:
- fond@dorking.surrey.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window