Financial history FRIENDS OF SOUTH MILFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1068754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.82k £14.52k £13.43k £12.92k £8.07k
Total expenditure £11.00k £7.45k £16.49k £11.57k £5.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A