THEATR IOLO LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is to have a society in which all children can feel empowered and inspired. We strive to do this by enriching the lives of children through memorable experiences that challenge the mind and stir the imagination. At the forefront of creating theatre for children from babies to teenagers, we are passionate about nurturing and igniting their imagination and creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 28 January 1998: Standard registration
- THEATR IOLO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN COTSEN | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Anne Hayward | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Becky Welton | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lewis Naylor | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Baxter | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Matthew Fisher | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Hatfield | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Edwards | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Romaine Perridge | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Paige Lawley | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Elisabeth Meikle Thomas | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £322.84k | £306.67k | £333.22k | £365.94k | £347.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.86k | £279.03k | £334.95k | £414.35k | £291.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £279.27k | N/A | £259.57k | £313.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 OCTOBER 1996 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 OCTOBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JANUARY 2005 as amended on 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP THE KNOWLEDGE, ENJOYMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS AND TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF THEATRICAL AND OTHER RELATED EDUCATIONAL AND ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Theatr Iolo
Chapter
Market Road
CARDIFF
CF5 1QE
- Phone:
- 02920613782
- Email:
- hello@theatriolo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window