The Snaith School Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Discos for pupils in Key Stage 3 held in school on a Friday Evening 3 times a year. Each year we hold a Christmas/Easter/Summer Bingo, these 3 events are open to the public and attract a great deal of support from the local community. We use Bags2school to generate income 3 times a year. We hold at least 1 school non-uniform day and help at other school events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 August 1997: Standard registration
- SNAITH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET WRIGHT | Chair | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Holmes | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Suzanne Caine | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
KarenJayne Howarth | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.74k | £5.15k | £8.93k | £4.45k | £3.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770 | £6.30k | £2.50k | £5.97k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 1996 as amended on 02 Nov 2020 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SNAITH SCHOOL
PONTEFRACT ROAD
SNAITH
GOOLE
DN14 9LB
- Phone:
- 01405860327
- Email:
- ssa@thesnaithschool.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window