THE ROYAL NAVY (EXPENDABLE) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Defined Groups
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 1997: Standard registration
- 15 August 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £657.77k | £728.52k | £831.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £657.77k | £728.52k | £831.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 01 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 18 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 18 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 13 July 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 19 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 23 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 23 MARCH 1995 AND SCHEME SEALED 22ND NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 23/2/06 LINKED TO CHARITY NO 259192 FOR ACCOUNTING PURPOSES BY UNITING DIRECTION 29/6/99
Charitable objects
A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) ESTABLISHED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF THE 23RD MARCH 1995 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES AFFECTED BY THE SAID SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window