Financial history THE BRIDGE CHURCH, CHEPSTOW

Charity number: 1063495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £148.49k £129.20k £119.09k £170.25k £198.27k
Total expenditure £161.19k £117.81k £122.64k £145.99k £166.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A