THE SHREWSBURY EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular activities - public worship each Sunday and prayer/Bible study meetings on weeknights. Quarterly church members' meetings for church business. Young peoples' activities - Care and instruction of pre-school children in creche.. Finances - managed by the Treasurer. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 11 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip William Towers | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Walter Kissack | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN JOHN ALCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KERON DAVID FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.32k | £48.73k | £32.14k | £51.20k | £67.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.25k | £40.08k | £35.17k | £47.88k | £50.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 19 DECEMBER 1986, 19 JUNE 1998 AND 2 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 15/3/13
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE CHURCH AND THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE CHURCH IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 UNDERDALE ROAD
SHREWSBURY
SY2 5EE
- Phone:
- 01743344018
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
shrewsburyevangelicalchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window