THE DEREK AND JEANNIE TANGYE MINACK CHRONICLES NATURE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the education of the public about the Minack Chronicles and to preserve Oliver Land as a place of solitude to which the public may have access. 2. To support the work of the Cornwall Heritage and Wildlife Trust and other charities as Trusties may determine. 3. To promote the care and treatment of sick and injured animals and to assist those that cannot affort the treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- 21 January 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- DEREK AND JEANNIE TANGYE MINACK CHRONICLES NATURE TRUST (Working name)
- MINACK CHRONICLES TRUST (Working name)
- THE MINACK CHRONICLES TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.04k | £5.01k | £6.00k | £3.00k | £51.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £4.67k | £5.99k | £3.47k | £13.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 02 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 02 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 2002..
Charitable objects
1) THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC OPEN SPACE. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR VETERINARY TREATMENT. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES TO STUDENTS. 4) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THE CORNWALL HERITAGE TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 291607). 5) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THE CORNWALL WILDLIFE TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 214929).
Area of benefit
PENWITH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window