MEDIATION SOUTH & WEST WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1997: Standard registration
- 22 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MEDIATION SOUTH AND WEST WALES (Previous name)
- TAWE AFAN NEDD MEDIATION LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1997, AS AMENDED 17 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CITIZENS AND COMMUNITIES IN AND AROUND THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA, NEATH PORT TALBOT, CARMARTHENSHIRE AND PEMBROKESHIRE WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE ANY SUCH DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE.
Area of benefit
THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA, NEATH PORT TALBOT, CARMARTHENSHIRE AND PEMBROKESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window