CHELTENHAM OPEN DOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a place to meet for those who are suffering hardship. Breakfast and a hot meal are provided on 3 weekdays and on Sundays. Facilities include showers and a free clothes store.Volunteers listen and help with problems, we also liaise with other agencies on guests behalf. At Christmas we provide a 4 day shelter for those on their own.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Angela O'Kane | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Simon Lee Bussey | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Avril Pattison-Sharp | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Hutchings | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cheryl Elizabeth Whiting | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.30k | £396.98k | £140.13k | £214.89k | £212.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.09k | £119.12k | £188.15k | £206.14k | £296.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOVEMBER 1998, AND 11 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 21 Oct 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 The Charity's objects (“the Objects”) are in Cheltenham, Gloucestershire, England (“the Area of Benefit”) the relief of poverty, hardship and social or emotional distress among persons who are vulnerable, disadvantaged and / or lonely. 3.2 For the purpose of this clause, “vulnerable”, “disadvantaged” and “lonely” might be as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs; discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender re-assignment; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards; crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society).
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Grosvenor Street
CHELTENHAM
GL52 2SQ
- Phone:
- 01242 577418
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window