GREATFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 08 August 1997: Standard registration
- 11 November 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BETTIE WILLIS CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATFIELD ESTATE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY MAP ENCLOSED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT" ) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND T PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE" ) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
SEE MAP REFERENCE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window