DONINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1063830
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Village Community Centre, with bar and kitchen facility, available for hire, general functions etc. Also providing a sports hall gym type facility.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023

Total income: £33,117
Total expenditure: £32,722

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DONINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
  • DONINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN CLARKE Chair 02 February 2013
None on record
KAREN MARSHALL Trustee 02 February 2014
None on record
CHRISTOPHER WRAY Trustee 02 February 2013
LINCOLNSHIRE PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE
Received: On time
JANE INKLEY Trustee
None on record
RICHARD WRAY Trustee
DONINGTON POORS LAND CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £35.39k £19.07k £22.70k £35.55k £33.12k
Total expenditure £37.09k £18.66k £16.56k £36.95k £32.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.08k N/A £10.00k £19.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 August 2024 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 07 August 2024 160 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 26 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 26 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 April 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old Barn
Northorpe
Donington
Spalding
PE11 4XY
Phone:
07922625308
Website:

No information available