Financial history WOODPECKERS NURSERY

Charity number: 1064941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/01/2020 06/01/2021 06/01/2022 06/01/2023 06/01/2024
Total gross income £92.83k £86.96k £68.36k £66.74k £95.31k
Total expenditure £94.65k £87.30k £65.24k £78.25k £92.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £44.81k £63.39k £44.99k
Income from government grants £7.71k £59.18k £1.49k N/A N/A