The Squire Patton Boggs Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes. The Charity makes payments to charitable organisations which make applications to it. In the main these payments are made to charities which work with children and young people, the elderly and disabled and voluntary bodies which have charitable status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 August 1997: Standard registration
- HAMMONDS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- HAMMONDS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE EDGE AND ELLISON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE EDGE ELLISON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE HAMMOND SUDDARDS EDGE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE THOUSANDTH MAN - RICHARD BURNS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew John Giles | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Barber | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Adams | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brooke | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Prew Lumley | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE HAXBY | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SPENCER JAMES McKAY | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID STONES | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.76k | £72.18k | £65.65k | £72.61k | £91.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.27k | £83.20k | £90.98k | £99.48k | £138.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 28 NOVEMBER 2000. as amended on 19 Apr 2021 as amended on 19 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (UK) LLP
RUTLAND HOUSE
148 EDMUND STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B3 2JR
- Phone:
- 01212223442
- Email:
- liz.harris@squirepb.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window