Trustees The Squire Patton Boggs Charitable Trust
Charity number: 1064028

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew John Giles | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Barber | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Adams | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brooke | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Prew Lumley | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE HAXBY | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SPENCER JAMES McKAY | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID STONES | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.