THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH-DEBENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the trust is to raise funds to enable donations to be made towards projects concerning restoration, maintaining the fabric and similar works to St Mary's Church Debenham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE MAUREEN WATTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROGER WILLIAM RHYS COCKERTON FCA | Trustee | 12 May 2003 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND GEORGE WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £719 | £855 | £613 | £818 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23k | £21.05k | £38 | £39 | £32 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST MAY 1997
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS IS ESTABLISHED TO HELP THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST. MARY'S DEBENHAM TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY, INSURE AND ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY'S DEBENHAM, IN THE DIOCESE OF ST. EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH, AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT IT AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
DEBENHAM, SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 HIGH STREET
DEBENHAM
STOWMARKET
IP14 6QL
- Phone:
- 01728860140
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window