THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH

Charity number: 1063271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help to maintain St Lawrence Church, Stratford Sub Castle.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,640
Total expenditure: £4,096

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH STRATFORD SUB CASTLE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Donald Tyndale McGill Chair 26 January 2021
None on record
David James Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Philip Andrew Waddell Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Rosemary Winson Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Alix Smith Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Heather Balston Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
JEFFREY LONG Trustee 30 January 2013
STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE CHARITY
Received: On time
Stephen Andrew Brown Trustee 16 November 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.38k £2.76k £15.17k £3.89k £4.64k
Total expenditure £9.14k £6.14k £1.39k £1.79k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 SHAKESPEARE ROAD
SALISBURY
SP1 3LA
Phone:
01722331745
Website:

No information available