WELTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1063827
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Welton pre-school provides early years educational services for children from the age of 2 up to school starting age. We operate on the grounds of William Farr senior school in the Lincolnshire village of Welton. We aim to provide a happy, enjoyable and secure environment where parents and carers feel confident to leave their children. We also offer 'Breakfast' and 'After School' club services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £70,117
Total expenditure: £80,863

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1997: Standard registration
  • 14 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 14 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1020018 SUDBROOKE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MALVERN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
  • MALVERN PLAYGROUP (WELTON) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £58.76k £82.77k £92.23k £70.12k £70.12k
Total expenditure £61.30k £67.88k £72.46k £80.86k £80.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £53.69k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.01k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2022 04 June 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 04 June 2023 4 days late
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 September 2020 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 13 September 2020 105 days late