Financial history GET KIDS GOING

Charity number: 1063471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.12m £423.53k £868.27k £1.80m £1.41m
Total expenditure £816.73k £580.60k £764.94k £985.86k £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.32k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £876.99k N/A £632.61k £1.54m £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £241.44k N/A £235.66k £268.48k £355.35k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £194.38k N/A £197.26k £212.59k £253.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £622.36k N/A £567.67k £773.27k £761.45k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k N/A £13.50k £14.00k £14.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £172.89k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £55.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0