3RD ITCHEN NORTH (BITTERNE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUT GROUP COMPRISING SQUIRRELS, BEAVERS,CUBS,SCOUTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 10 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iwona Beckingham Iwona Lejbik | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Draper Draper | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Drake | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eastman | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Travis | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anderson Neil Anderson | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68k | £16.46k | £25.57k | £34.75k | £53.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £15.13k | £21.21k | £32.56k | £44.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £10.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF 14 MAY 1962 AS AMENDED BY A FURTHER DEED OF 14 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GORDON HALL
19 Brook Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO18 6AZ
- Phone:
- 02380473272
- Email:
- 3RDITCHENNORTH@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window