Financial history KINGS HEATH PLAYCARE

Charity number: 1063463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £216.03k £192.88k £276.71k £291.76k £345.05k
Total expenditure £210.77k £220.92k £276.28k £291.69k £319.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A