CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (OUTREACH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.Advancement of Christianity through evangelism and setting up branches worldwide. 2.Winning souls into the Kingdom of God by teaching the Word of God and preaching the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ. 3.Looking after the physical and spiritual well being of members. 4.Relief of poverty,sickness and distress and giving financial assistance to charitable bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 11 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR AMOS ODUNAYO FASHINA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev ENOCK BUNMI FASHINA | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ADEBAYO AJAYI | Trustee | 26 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELDER OLUGBENGA BABATOLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELDER OLUBISI S AKINYEMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELDER SUNDAY AJILORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELDER SAMSON AWORINDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JOSEPH ADEWUYI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELDER MICHEAL AFOLABI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELDER ADEDEJI OLALEYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.41k | £364.83k | £337.35k | £345.15k | £381.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.32k | £261.92k | £313.10k | £354.90k | £319.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £120.25k | £93.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 1997 AND 15 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
[1] TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD , LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, PRAYER AND DISTRIBUTING OF GOSPEL TRACTS, AND BY ENSURING SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND PROMOTING PHYSICAL WELLBEING OF MEMBERS AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO LIVE A LIFE OF RIGHTEOUSNESS, HOLINESS AND PREVALING PRAYER. [2] TO RELIEVE BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY COOPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS OFFER HELP, BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE , TO VICTIM OF WAR , DISASTER AND OTHER MISFORTUNE LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
413 HIGH ROAD
TOTTENHAM
LONDON
N17 6RD
- Phone:
- 02088080520
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window