THE RIBA EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ex Gratia Payments and Maintenance Grants to Students of Architecture who are experiencing financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 July 1997: Standard registration
- 22 May 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 May 2014: Funds transferred to 210566 ROYAL INSTITUTE OF BRITISH ARCHITECTS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.77k | £17.01k | £31.54k | £236.69k | £27.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.48k | £36.10k | £23.60k | £57.52k | £50.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 07 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 07 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 16 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 16 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 28 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 28 July 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS IN CONNECTION THEREWITH (2) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN ARCHITECTURE GENERALLY AND TO AWARD GRANTS TO ARCHITECTS AND OTHER PERSONS IN CONNECTION THEREWITH (3) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH TO IMPROVE THE GENERAL PRACTICE OF ARCHITECTURE (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HISTORICAL RESEARCH TO IMPROVE THE EDUCATION OF ARCHITECTS (V) THE DISSEMINATION OF TEACHING OR THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH CONCERNING ARCHITECTURE (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR OF THOSE PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR WHO ARE PREPARING TO ENTER THE PROFESSION OF ARCHITECTURE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window