GUILDFORD ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide infrastructure support to the local voluntary and community sector and to provide a volunteer brokerage service for voluntary organisations operating locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 July 1997: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- GAVS (Working name)
- GUILFORD ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.08k | £151.20k | £116.52k | £76.35k | £10.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.03k | £144.64k | £84.49k | £110.10k | £10.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 16 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 08 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 05 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 04 November 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 31 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 1998 15TH DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF THE BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND , IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES, HUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window