THE MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for the care and the permanent public display of the Sunbury Millennium Embroidery and for the maintenance and administration of the gallery that houses the work. Entry to the view the work is free and talks are regularly given to visiting groups including local schools. The gallery hosts accompanying exhibitions and engages in a number of community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 February 2001: Standard registration
- 20 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1162121 THE MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
- THE SUNBURY MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY (Working name)
- THE MILLENIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO THE ARCHAEOLOGY, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, WILDLIFE, DEVELOPMENT AND DAILY LIFE OF SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Area of benefit
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window