THE GREEK CYPRIOT COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care, education and cultural awareness of the Greek community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR A L CHARALAMBIDES | Chair |
|
||||||
Christos Andreas Karaolis | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Antony Sophoclides | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARALAMBOS SOPHOCLIDES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY YEROLEMOU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.33k | £19.62k | £16.00k | £21.91k | £29.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.25k | £29.37k | £54.14k | £35.18k | £50.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2022 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2021 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2021 | 353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE GREEK CYPRIOT COMMUNITY BY RELIEVING POVERTY, ADVANCING EDUCATION, ADVANCING RELIGION AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
G C C T
BRITANNIA ROAD
LONDON
N12 9RU
- Phone:
- 02072783210
- Email:
- aris@alcharlesltd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window