DEMENTIA VOICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dementia Voice has four main objectives: to provide information about dementia and services for people with dementia; to promote, undertake and publish research about dementia; to provide training for those who work with people with dementia and to offer consultancy to organisations providing services for people with dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 April 1998: Standard registration
- 09 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.70k | £39.22k | £39.22k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 18 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 11 February 2011 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 28 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF THOSE PERSONS WHO WORK WITH PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA AND SIMILAR CONDITIONS AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window