Financial history THE ROLLRIGHT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1068450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £25.04k £15.03k £16.49k £16.96k £29.67k
Total expenditure £23.95k £16.86k £30.76k £18.41k £19.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A