Financial history THE GILANDER FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1070793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £45.32k £61.00k £54.09k £53.02k £54.66k
Total expenditure £49.18k £44.35k £45.82k £48.27k £71.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A