BRAMPTON VILLAGE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising events in order to advance the education of pupils in the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 July 1997: Standard registration
- BRAMPTON COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Sykes | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Mason | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicki Henson | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Paul | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Matthew Lovell | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Silvester | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £15.78k | £16.43k | £20.00k | £17.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.42k | £8.78k | £10.65k | £17.00k | £17.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GREEN
BRAMPTON
HUNTINGDON
CAMBS
PE28 4RF
- Phone:
- 07894093108
- Email:
- bramptonpta@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window