MUSTARD SEED COMMUNITIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS FOR ACTIVITIES OF MUSTARD SEED COMMUNITIES IN THE COUNTRIES WHERE IT OPERATES; CURRENTLY IN JAMAICA, DOMINICAN REPUBLIC, NICARAGUA ,ZIMBABWE AND MALAWI. OUR MAIN FOCUS IS NOW ON RAISING FUNDS FOR ZIMBABWE, WHERE WE ARE RUNNING HOMES FOR AIDS ORPHANS AND FEEDING PROGRAMMES FOR CHILDREN. WE ALSO SEND VOLUNTEERS TO WORK IN MUSTARD SEED LOCATIONS, MAINLY IN JAMAICA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dominican Republic
- Haiti
- Jamaica
- Nicaragua
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 April 1998: Standard registration
- JAMAICA MUSTARD SEED - UK (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Mitchell | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hyacinth Parsons | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|||||
KUDA MAGORIMBO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.86k | £52.41k | £5.26k | £7.12k | £22.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £50.03k | £20.02k | £24.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MAY 1997, AND AMENDED 7TH OCTOBER 1997 AND 25TH FEBRUARY 1998 AND 21 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN JAMAICA, HAITI AND OTHER CARIBBEAN COUNTRIES (INCLUDING STARVATION, SICKNESS OR ANY PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR AFFLICTION) IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROVIDE FOOD, HEALING, CLOTHING, SHELTER, TRAINING AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
JAMAICA, HAITI AND OTHER CARIBBEAN COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vale Lodge
30 North Cray Road
Bexley
Kent
- Phone:
- 07770931477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window