BEATING BOWEL CANCER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beating Bowel Cancer is the support and campaigning charity for everyone affected by bowel cancer. We provide vital practical and emotional help ? on the phone, digitally and face to face. We run the UK?s only nurse-led specialist helpline and bring patients together to share invaluable experience and support, through our website, social media and major events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 July 1997: Standard registration
- 05 October 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 05 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1071038 BOWEL CANCER UK
- BEATING BOWEL CANCER: AWARENESS,EDUCATION AND SUPPORT (Working name)
- BEATING BOWEL CANCER AWARENESS, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 01/01/2018 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34m | £2.01m | £1.68m | £1.15m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87m | £2.34m | £2.10m | £1.36m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.73m | £1.35m | £1.05m | £632.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £536.81k | £535.03k | £494.06k | £376.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £74.62k | £121.98k | £129.23k | £102.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.01k | £3.43k | £1.12k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £36.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.00k | £17.74k | £41.12k | £190 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £867.08k | £1.16m | £947.35k | £652.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £1.18m | £1.15m | £711.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.31k | £9.94k | £10.60k | £5.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2018 | 26 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2018 | 26 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 18 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8/10/99 & 5/10/2010 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17/7/1997, 11/05/2006 AND 11/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS, IN ALL ASPECTS OF COLORECTAL CANCER , INCLUDING BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO ITS CAUSES, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE; TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM COLORECTAL CANCER; AND TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND ACQUAINTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window