THE DOROTHY WHITNEY ELMHIRST TRUST

Charity Number: 1064069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To further the interests of Dorothy Whitney Elmhirst supported in her life time. Plus local charitable activites.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £172,667
Total expenditure: £203,317

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Ann Franklin Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record
KATHLEEN BURT Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record
CHANTELLE HIBBS Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record
Nicholas Shattock Trustee 03 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £61.76k £50.19k £75.11k £140.81k £172.67k
Total expenditure £96.25k £216.08k £197.37k £169.55k £203.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 205
Jersey
JE4 8ST
Phone:
07936384190
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available