Financial history ARTICULATE ARTS LTD

Charity Number: 1064645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £61.81k £38.59k £68.03k £38.96k £88.82k
Total expenditure £34.52k £32.26k £63.04k £64.33k £32.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A