Financial history THE GEOFF HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1067258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £52.12k £43.04k £60.59k £64.33k £56.10k
Total expenditure £28.49k £19.57k £25.93k £42.97k £34.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A