Q: ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Q:Alliance runs youth groups, support groups, provides advice and information, and encourages community activities for the LGBT community and organisations who provide services for them, in Bedford,Milton Keynes and Buckinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £85,869 from 4 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 18 June 1998: Standard registration
- MK YOUTHLINE (Working name)
- MILTON KEYNES LESBIAN, GAY AND BISEXUAL YOUTHLINE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stevie Eglinton-Pacitti | Chair | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Kellett | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anne Butler-Quinn | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER KINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.16k | £17.47k | £115.85k | £80.55k | £211.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.89k | £22.30k | £68.77k | £86.41k | £146.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.20k | £85.87k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF INCORPORATION DATED.................. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL CRISES EXPERIENCED BY YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY OR BISEXUAL OR IN DOUBT OF THEIR SEXUALITY BY THE GIVING OF INFORMATION AND HELP FROM MEMBERS OF MILTON KEYNES LESBIAN, GAY AND BISEXUAL YOUTHLINE, WORKING UNDER DIRECTION WHO ARE SELECTED AND PREPARED TO GIVE INFORMATION AND HELP.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Q:Alliance
77 Alston Drive
Bradwell Abbey
MILTON KEYNES
MK13 9HG
- Phone:
- 07742002094
- Email:
- info@qalliance.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window