BRETONS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social Club, Archery Clubs, Model flying Club, Model railway Club, Sea Angling Club, Freshwater Angling Club, Junior Football Clubs, Table Tennis Clubs, Darts teams, Horticultural Society, Cribbage team, Childrens Preschool Group, Scouts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 14 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL BLYTHE | Chair | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE BAILEY | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL CRESSEY | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS NOLAN | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Nolan | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA BLYTHE | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Cashman | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA REYNOLDS | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.47k | £31.68k | £31.20k | £74.48k | £56.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.56k | £26.55k | £11.92k | £33.29k | £42.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 January 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 January 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAVERING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
HAVERING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRETONS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Bretons Manor
411 Rainham Road
RAINHAM
Essex
RM13 7LP
- Phone:
- 07709172191
- Email:
- NIGEL@BRETONSSAC.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window