THE RUACH CHAVURAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Promotion and Encouragement of the Practice and Study of the Jewish Religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

28 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAMELA WATSON | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rina Isaacson | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID ROTH | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Maraney | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEONORA SAMUEL | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN WILFRED SAMUEL BA, OXON | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA WYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYDIA BURMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAOMI GOLDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET BERENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARA BENSUSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE DRAPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTIN SIMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER MASSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE WOOLF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHY WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIENNE CATO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART LINKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY WAINER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH ROTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO WOOLF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN MARCUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARA COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IVAN KOPPEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £6.77k | £7.16k | £5.18k | £6.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £2.95k | £10.42k | £5.79k | £7.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PRACTICE AND STUDY OF THE JEWISH RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FLORENCE PARK ROAD
OXFORD
OX4 3PN
- Phone:
- 07909 766495
- Email:
- hilarywainer@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window