Financial history HACKNEY COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1069736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.22m £3.71m £3.90m £2.94m £2.02m
Total expenditure £2.46m £3.08m £4.17m £3.04m £2.08m
Income from government contracts £46.08k £298.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £807.82k £1.48m £924.51k N/A £987.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £54.12k £109.71k £19.56k £31.24k £7.01k
Income - Other trading activities £90.26k £330.62k £566.78k £383.19k £124.94k
Income - Charitable activities £2.02m £3.26m £3.30m £2.50m £1.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.91k £3.30k £3.42k £16.60k £31.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £4.07k £11.33k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.39m £2.99m £3.99m £2.89m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.99k £98.98k £181.93k £148.23k £140.51k
Expenditure - Governance £18.73k £20.58k £29.28k £51.46k £26.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £289.98k £469.64k £469.64k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0