WINDRUSH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It celebrates the Caribbean men and women who served Britain in WWII and who also settled in the UK from 22 June 1948, having travelled on the ship Empire Windrush, and who helped to rebuild ; (2) promotes good race & community relations, works to eliminate discrimination and encourage equality of opportunity for all; (3) designs and deliver heritage and arts projects, programmes and initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR TORRINGTON CBE | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DIONE MCDONALD | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULETTE VERONA FEURTADO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £15.10k | £14.86k | £46.93k | £161.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £11.69k | £12.16k | £39.13k | £151.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS, ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY MAKING THE PUBLIC AWARE OF THE CONTRIBUTION TO PUBLIC SERVICES, COMMERCE, COMMUNITY SERVICE, TRADE UNION, SPORT, ENTERTAINMENT, THE ARTS, RACE RELATIONS, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND OTHER ACTIVATES IN BRITAIN AND THE COMMONWEALTH, OF AFRICAN-AMERICAN SETTLERS AND THEIR DESCENDANTS, IN PARTICULAR WEST INDIAN SETTLERS WHO ARRIVED AT TILBURY DOCKS, ESSEX, ENGLAND ON 22 JUNE 1948 ON THE SHIP SS EMPIRE WINDRUSH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BRAMDEAN GARDENS
LONDON
SE12 0NT
- Phone:
- 07941361997
- Email:
- windrush.project@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window